Polin et al v. Graham et al
Plaintiff: Tim Polin, Larry Grogan, Deborah Yochum, Benjamin Smoak, Beth Grogan, Carol Polin, Michael Buhler, Laura Smoak, Sylvia Zeigler, Larry Irwin and Randall Zeigler
Defendant: Michael Graham, David Snoddy, Angela Johnson, Mike Graham, Amy Price and Terri McKee
Case Number: 6:2019cv02065
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 63 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #62 Deficiency Memo, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Avenue Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 (with return documents) and Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 (kric, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 62 Deficiency Memo as to Michael Graham. Amended answer and counter complaint, Motion to Withdraw Default, and 26.01 interrogatories See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/27/2019. (kric, ) Modified on 9/17/2019 to edit text (kric, ).
September 17, 2019 Filing 61 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #60 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Avenue Camden (with return documents), TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 (kric, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 60 Deficiency Memo Amended answer and counter complaint and 26.01 interrogatories See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/27/2019. (kric, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 59 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #58 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Avenue Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 (with returned documents). (kric, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 58 Deficiency Memo to Terri McKee. Amended answer and counter complaint and 26.01 interrogatories See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/27/2019. (kric, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 57 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #56 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Avenue Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 (with returned documents) Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608. (kric, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 56 Deficiency Memo Amended answer and counter complaint and 26.01 interrogatories See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/27/2019. (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 55 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #54 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Amy Price 170 Washington Avenue Camden, TN 38320 (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 54 Deficiency Memo regarding mailing of extra copies for the clerk to serve by mail upon counsel See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 53 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #52 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Amy Price 170 Washington Avenue Camden, TN 38320 (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 52 Deficiency Memo 49, 50, 51 See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/19/2019. (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 48 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #47 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 Amy Price170 Washington Street Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 46 ***DOCUMENT MAILED. Provided copies with stamped addressed envelope #45 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Parker Poe Attorney (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 44 ***DOCUMENT MAILED provided copies with stamped envelope #42 MOTION to Withdraw, #43 Amended Answer to Complaint placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Parker Poe Attorney (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 51 AMENDED ANSWER and Counter Complaint to #1 Complaint, by Amy Price. (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 50 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Amy Price. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Address by Amy Price. "Street" changed to "Avenue" (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 47 Deficiency Memo 42, 43, 45 See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/20/2019. (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Graham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 43 AMENDED ANSWER and AMENDED COUNTER COMPLAINT to #1 Complaint, by Michael Graham. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Graham, #2 Exhibit A postage lable, #3 Envelope)(kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw Default by Michael Graham. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Graham, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 41 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Provided copies in postage paid envelope #39 Answer to Complaint, #40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Parker Poe Attorney (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER and Counter Complaintto #1 Complaint, by Angela Johnson.(kric, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope cover letter) (kric, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 38 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #37 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Street Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 6:19-cv-02065-DCC-KFM Date Filed 09/09/19 Entry Number 37 Page 1 of 2 David Snoddy 74 County Road 29 Killen, AL 35645 (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 37 Deficiency Memo 34, 25 26.01 interrogatories and amended answer with counter complaint See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/19/2019. (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 36 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Provided copies and stamped envelope #34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #35 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Robert H Jordan Parker Poe Adams and Bernstein LLP 200 Meeting Street Suite 301 Charleston, SC 29401 (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 33 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #31 Deficiency Memo, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Street Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 32 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Provided copies of #30 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #28 Notice of Change of Address, #29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories and #31 Deficiency Memo, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Parker Poe Attorney, c/o Robert H. Jordan, 200 Meeting Street, Suite 301, Charleston, SC 29401 (kric, ) Modified on 9/9/2019 to update address to Parker Poe Attorney (kric, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 Deficiency Memo 28, 29, 30 change of address, 26.01 interrogatories and amended answer with counter complaint See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 9/19/2019. (kric, ) (Main Document 31 replaced on 9/9/2019) (kric, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Terri McKee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Terri McKee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by David Snoddy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Snoddy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Snoddy. Address updated. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 27 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #26 Proper Form Order,, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Street Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 104 County Road 455 Killen, AL 35645 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608. LR 26.01 included for Amy Price, Angela Johnson and Terri McKee. (kric, )
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Defendants Amy Price, Angela Johnson, and Terri McKee are directed to complete, sign, and return the attached Pro Se Party's Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories by 9/19/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Each defendant must fill out their own set of interrogatories. Defendants Amy Price, Angela Johnson, and Terri McKee are ordered to always keep the Clerk of Court advised in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/29/19. (ctuc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 24 Order on Motion to Withdraw placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Price 170 Washington Street Camden, TN 38320 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 David Snoddy 104 County Road 455 Killen, AL 35645 Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 (kric, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #23 Motion to Withdraw Entries of Default Against Certain Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/28/19.(ctuc, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw Entries of Default Against Certain Defendants by Michael Buhler, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Benjamin Smoak, Laura Smoak, Deborah Yochum, Randall Zeigler, Sylvia Zeigler. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Osborne, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #21 Order, #20 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Michael Graham c/o Dairy Queen 510 Spring Street Bluefield, VA 24605 David Snoddy 104 County Road 455 Killen, AL 35645 Angela Johnson 44 Page Farm Road Sherbrooke, MA 01770 Terri McKee 1422 Scale Street Raleigh, NC 27608 Amy Price 170 Washington Street Camden, TN 38320. A copy of the public docket sheet was mailed to each defendant and LR26.01 interrogatories were mailed to David Snoddy only as directed. (kric, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Within 21 days (Plus three mailing days), defendant David Snoddy is directed to complete, sign, and return the attached Pro Se Partys Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories. Defendant Snoddy is ordered to always keep the Clerk of Court advised in writing of any change of address. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail defendant Snoddy a copy of the public docket sheet for this action, a copy of this order, and a copy of the Local Civ. Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.) interrogatories. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/27/19. (ctuc, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing pro se defendants Michael Graham, Angela Johnson, Terri McKee, and Amy Price to always keep the Clerk advised in writing of any change of address. The Clerk is directed to mail defendants Michael Graham, Angela Johnson, Terri McKee, and Amy Price a copy of the public docket sheet for this action and a copy of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/27/19. (ctuc, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Amy Price, David Snoddy, Terri McKee, Michael Graham, Angela Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope to Attorney)(abuc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Angela Johnson, Terri McKee (abuc)
August 24, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byMichael Buhler, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Benjamin Smoak, Laura Smoak, Deborah Yochum, Randall Zeigler, Sylvia Zeigler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Default)(Osborne, Robert) (Main Document 15 replaced on 8/26/2019) (abuc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/26/2019) (abuc). Modified to replace documents with corrected documents provided by filing user on 8/26/2019 (abuc).
August 24, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byMichael Buhler, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Benjamin Smoak, Laura Smoak, Deborah Yochum, Randall Zeigler, Sylvia Zeigler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default)(Osborne, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Amy Price (abuc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Amy Price byMichael Buhler, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Benjamin Smoak, Laura Smoak, Deborah Yochum, Randall Zeigler, Sylvia Zeigler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Default)(Osborne, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Graham (abuc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Michael Graham a/k/a Mike Graham byMichael Buhler, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Benjamin Smoak, Laura Smoak, Deborah Yochum, Randall Zeigler, Sylvia Zeigler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Default)(Osborne, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Zeigler, Randall Zeigler, Deborah Yochum, Benjamin Smoak, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Laura Smoak, Michael Buhler. David Snoddy served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service Upon David Snoddy)(Osborne, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Zeigler, Randall Zeigler, Deborah Yochum, Benjamin Smoak, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Laura Smoak, Michael Buhler. Michael Graham served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Osborne, Robert) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/9/2019) (abuc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (abuc). Modified to replace the main document and to add an additional attachment, both provided by filing user on 8/9/2019 (abuc).
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Zeigler, Randall Zeigler, Deborah Yochum, Benjamin Smoak, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Laura Smoak, Michael Buhler. Angela Johnson served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Osborne, Robert) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/9/2019) (abuc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (abuc). Modified to replace the main document and to add an additional attachment, both provided by filing user on 8/9/2019 (abuc).
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Zeigler, Randall Zeigler, Deborah Yochum, Benjamin Smoak, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Laura Smoak, Michael Buhler. Amy Price served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Osborne, Robert) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/9/2019) (abuc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (abuc). Modified to replace the main document and to add an additional attachment, both provided by filing user on 8/9/2019 (abuc).
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Zeigler, Randall Zeigler, Deborah Yochum, Benjamin Smoak, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Laura Smoak, Michael Buhler. Terri McKee served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Osborne, Robert) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/9/2019) (abuc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (abuc). Modified to replace the main document and to add an additional attachment, both provided by filing user on 8/9/2019 (abuc).
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Graham, Angela Johnson, Terri McKee, Amy Price, David Snoddy. (abuc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Buhler, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Benjamin Smoak, Laura Smoak, Deborah Yochum, Randall Zeigler, Sylvia Zeigler.(abuc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Graham, Angela Johnson, Terri McKee, Amy Price, David Snoddy ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8571817.), filed by Sylvia Zeigler, Randall Zeigler, Deborah Yochum, Benjamin Smoak, Carol Polin, Tim Polin, Beth Grogan, Larry Grogan, Larry Irwin, Laura Smoak, Michael Buhler. Service due by 10/21/2019(abuc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/24/2019) (abuc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polin et al v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Snoddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Polin
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Grogan
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Yochum
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Smoak
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Grogan
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Polin
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Buhler
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Smoak
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Zeigler
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Irwin
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Zeigler
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?