Clements v. Bank of New York Mellon, The
Plaintiff: Stephen A Clements
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Case Number: 6:2019cv02161
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Stephen A Clements 308 Garfield Lane Simpsonville, SC 29681 (kric, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Bruce H. Hendricks. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: US District Court, 300 E Washington Street, Greenville, SC 29601. (kric, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order - 1983 - No Service, #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Stephen A Clements placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Stephen A Clements 308 Garfield Lane Simpsonville, SC 29681 (kric, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION The undersigned recommends that the district court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/19/19. (ctuc, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/19/19. (ctuc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Stephen A Clements 308 Garfield Lane Simpsonville, SC 29681 with blank complaint form, 2 blank summons and 2 blank USM285 forms (kric, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal as it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint identified herein by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/7/19. (ctuc, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stephen A Clements. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(kric, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of New York Mellon, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX600008360.), filed by Stephen A Clements. Service due by 10/31/2019(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements v. Bank of New York Mellon, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?