Burnham v. Universal Health Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: William C Burnham
Defendant: Universal Health Services Inc, UHS of Greenville LLC and UHS of Greenville LLC-2
Case Number: 6:2019cv02325
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to William C Burnham 211 Morgan Avenue Greenwood, SC 29646 (gpre, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William C Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(gpre, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Proper Form Order, Summons form, USM-285 forms (3), Pro Se 26.01 Interrogatories, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to William C Burnham 211 Morgan Avenue Greenwood, SC 29646 (gpre, ) Modified on 8/21/2019 to add text (gpre, ).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 9/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/20/2019. (gpre, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/20/2019.(gpre, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (gpre, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by William C Burnham. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UHS of Greenville LLC(a South Carolina Registered Company), UHS of Greenville LLC(a Delaware Registered Company), Universal Health Services Inc, filed by William C Burnham. Service due by 11/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnham v. Universal Health Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Health Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHS of Greenville LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHS of Greenville LLC-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?