Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the use and benefit of Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co, Fluor Daniel Caribbean Inc, Travelers Casualty and Surety Co., Fidelity and Deposit Co of Maryland, Fluor Enterprises Inc, Federal Insurance Co and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv02419
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #23 Notice Other placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John C Dulske-Dykema Gossett PLLC 112 E Pecan Street, Suite 1800 San Antonio, TX 78205; Gregory M Weinstein-Weinstein Radcliff Pipkin LLP 8350 N. Central Expressway Suite 1550 Dallas, TX 75206; Jason M Ross-Dykema Gossett PLLC 1717 Main Street Suite 4200 Dallas, TX 75201 (alew, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Transfer Letter to Counsel re #21 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (alew, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 7:19-cv-00036. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINAL JUDGMENT: Defendants' request to dismiss this case is DENIED, and their request to transfer this case is GRANTED. Therefore, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Greenville Division. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/27/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' request to dismiss this case is DENIED, and Defendants' request to transfer this case is GRANTED. Therefore, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Greenville Division. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/26/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc.. (Dulske, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Scheduling Conference. Status Report due by 8/5/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/12/2019) (plp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Extend Time filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weinstein, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. re: #10 Response/Objection (Weinstein, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Having considered the motion #13 , the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED as modified. The parties are ORDERED to submit their status report on or before July 12, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/7/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Extend Time time for scheduling conference filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Extend Time for Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Report) (Weinstein, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc. re #10 Response/Objection (Dulske, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc. re #10 Response/Objection (Dulske, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc. re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Dulske, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before June 25, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/28/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Weinstein, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Federal Insurance Co., Fidelity and Deposit Co. of Maryland, Fluor Daniel Caribbean, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Travelers Casualty and Surety Co., Zurich American Insurance Co. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Weinstein, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Federal Insurance Co., Fidelity and Deposit Co. of Maryland, Fluor Daniel Caribbean, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Travelers Casualty and Surety Co., Zurich American Insurance Co. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Weinstein, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Federal Insurance Co., Fidelity and Deposit Co. of Maryland, Fluor Daniel Caribbean, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Travelers Casualty and Surety Co., Zurich American Insurance Co. Attorney Gregory M Weinstein added to party Federal Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory M Weinstein added to party Fidelity and Deposit Co. of Maryland(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory M Weinstein added to party Fluor Daniel Caribbean, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory M Weinstein added to party Fluor Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory M Weinstein added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory M Weinstein added to party Travelers Casualty and Surety Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory M Weinstein added to party Zurich American Insurance Co.(pty:dft) (Weinstein, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (plp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants per attorney's request. (plp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc. (Ross, Jason) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc. ($400 filing fee paid. Receipt No. 0539-9923747) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ross, Jason) Modified to show receipt number on 4/17/2019 (trt). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the use and benefit of Robert Lloyd Electric Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jason M Ross
Represented By: John C Dulske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Caribbean Inc
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Co.
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Co of Maryland
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Co
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?