Hunter v. ZF Transmissions Gray Court
Plaintiff: Jacob Cleo Hunter
Defendant: ZF Transmissions Gray Court
Case Number: 6:2019cv02503
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Order, #17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Jacob Cleo Hunter, 18 Transfer of Case Management, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jacob Cleo Hunter, 303 Irene Road, Gray Court, SC 29645. (kmca)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Timothy M Cain. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 300 E Washington Street, Room 239, Greenville, South Carolina 29601. ***New case number is 6-19-cv-2503-TMC. Please make a note of it for all future filings. (kmca)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION The undersigned recommends that the district court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 11/8/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/25/19. (ctuc, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/25/19. (ctuc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jacob Cleo Hunter 303 Irene Road Gray Court, SC 29645 with blank complaint, summons and USM285 forms (kric, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal as it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint identified above by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/1/19. (ctuc, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10 Reason: entered into wrong case number (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jacob Cleo Hunter 303 Irene Road Gray Court, SC 29645 with USM285 form (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/1/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The plaintiff is ordered to always keep the Clerk of Court advised in writing of any address change. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/10/19. (ctuc, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jacob Cleo Hunter.(kmca)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jacob Cleo Hunter. Response to Motion due by 9/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kmca) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kric, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZF Transmissions Gray Court, filed by Jacob Cleo Hunter. Service due by 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Notice of Rights)(kmca) Modified on 9/10/2019: to edit text (filing fee not paid) (kmca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. ZF Transmissions Gray Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Cleo Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Transmissions Gray Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?