Golden v. Apple Inc et al
Plaintiff: Larry Golden
Defendant: General Motors Company, LG Electronics USA Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc, Motorola Solutions Inc, Fairway Ford Lincoln of Greenville, AT&T Inc, Ford Global Technologies LLC, Apple Inc, Big O Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram, Qualcomm Inc, Panasonic Corporation, FCA US LLC, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Sprint Corporation, Samsung Electronics USA and Kevin Whitaker Chevrolet
Case Number: 6:2019cv02557
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Larry Golden.(kric, ) (kric, ).
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 NON-STANDARD ITEM RECEIVED: Exhibit I. Cell-All Smartphone (CD) from Larry Golden re: #16 Amended Complaint (kric, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 NON-STANDARD ITEM RECEIVED:Exhibit H. Conception of CMDC Device (CD) from Larry Golden re: #16 Amended Complaint. (kric, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc, Apple Inc, Big O Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram, FCA US LLC, Fairway Ford Lincoln of Greenville, Ford Global Technologies LLC, General Motors Company, Kevin Whitaker Chevrolet, LG Electronics USA Inc, Motorola Solutions Inc, Panasonic Corporation, Qualcomm Inc, Samsung Electronics USA, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group, filed by Larry Golden. Service due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 attachment to complaint "Amended complaint", #2 List of companies, #3 Exhibit A Patent No 10,163,287, #4 Exhibit B Patent No 9,589,439, #5 Exhibit C Patent No 9,096,189, #6 Exhibit D Patent No RE43,990, #7 Exhibit E Patent No RE43,891, #8 Exhibit6 F Patent Nop 7,385,497, #9 Exhibit G USPTO Disclosure Document, #10 Filed separately as a Non Standard Item (CD), #11 Exhibit I Filed Separately as a Non Standard Item (CD), #12 Exhibit J Respopnse Letters, #13 Exhibit K Claim Chart for the 287 Patent, #14 Exhibit L Claim chart for Apple Inc, #15 Exhibit M Claim Chart for Samsung, #16 Exhibit N Claim Chart for LG Electronics, #17 Exhibit O Claim chart for Qualcomm, #18 Exhibit P Claim chart for Motorola Solutions, #19 Exhibit Q Claim Chart for Panasonic, #20 Exhibit R Claim Chart for Ford, #21 Exhibit S Claim Chart for Chevrolet, #22 Exhibit T Claim chart for FCA, #23 Exhibit U Claim Chart for 439 Patent, #24 Exhibit V Claim Chart for the 189 Patent (appears to be multiple groups of page numbers), #25 Exhibit W Claim Chart for 990 Patent, #26 Exhibit X Claim Chart for 891 Patent, #27 Exhibit Y Claim Chart for 497 Patent) See non-standard item entries #17 and #18 . (kric, ) Modified on 10/15/2019 to add linkage. (kric, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 with blank complaint form and blank summons (kric, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 with pro se instruction guide as directed. (kric, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal because, as presented, it is frivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint identified herein by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/1/19. (ctuc, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The plaintiff is directed that the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina has a website which contains a Pro Se Guide with information on representing yourself in a civil action in this Court. The plaintiff is further directed to always keep the Clerk advised in writing if his address changes for any reason. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/1/19. (ctuc, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 7 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Larry Golden, 740 Woodruff Rd #1102, Greenville, SC 29607 (glev, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons attached to provide company addresses)(kric, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons attached to provide company addresses.)(kric, ) Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit text (kric, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Larry Golden.(abuc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc, Apple Inc, Big O Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram, FCA US LLC, Fairway Ford Lincoln of Greenville, Ford Global Technologies LLC, General Motors Company, Kevin Whitaker Chevrolet, LG Electronics USA Inc, Motorola Solutions Inc, Panasonic Corporation, Qualcomm Inc, Samsung Electronics USA, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX600008396.), filed by Larry Golden. Service due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Complaint Continued, #2 List of Defendants, #3 Exhibit A - Patent No. 10,163,287 ("the '287 Patent"), #4 Exhibit B - Patent No. 9,589,439 ("the '439' Patent"), #5 Exhibit C - No. 9,096,189 ("the '189 Patent"), #6 Exhibit D - Patent No. RE43,990 ("the '990 Patent"), #7 Exhibit E - Patent No. RE43,891 ("the '891 Patent"), #8 Exhibit F - Patent No. 7,385,497 ("the '497 Patent"))(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Ford Lincoln of Greenville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Global Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big O Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Corporate Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Whitaker Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?