Banks v. Transportation Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: Rosalind Nate Banks
Defendant: Denise Duville, Steven Corey, Bob Baker and Transportation Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv02654
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #17 Summons Issued, #16 Order Service - Non-Inmate, #11 Amended Complaint, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Rosalind Nate Banks 416 Crestmont Way Greenville, SC 29615 with service documents including issued summons, amended complaint and service order. (kric, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, The. Service due by 1/27/2020 (kric, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. The defendant is directed to file an answer to the complaint or otherwise plead. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/28/19. (ctuc, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rosalind Nate Banks.(kric, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, The, filed by Rosalind Nate Banks. Service due by 1/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/25/2019) (kric, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Rosalind Nate Banks 416 Crestmont Way Greenville, SC 29615 with blank complaint, summons. and LR26.01 interrogatories (kric, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal, as presented, because it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in her complaint identified herein by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/8/19. (ctuc, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Rosalind Nate Banks 416 Crestmont Way Greenville, SC 29615 with blank summons (kric, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/15/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/24/19. (ctuc, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX600008401.), filed by Rosalind Nate Banks. Service due by 12/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Letter from Transportation Security Administration, #2 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Transportation Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Nate Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Duville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?