Kosek v. Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc
Plaintiff: Kelly Kosek
Defendant: Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02661
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/21/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/23/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/22/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/29/2020, Discovery due by 5/29/2020, Motions due by 7/31/2020, Mediation Due by 6/26/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/1/2019. (gpre, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc.(Roth, Jonathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc.(Roth, Jonathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc.(Roth, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Kelly Kosek.(Arnold, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc.(Roth, Jonathan)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/17/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/31/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/31/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/21/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/23/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/22/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/22/2020, Discovery due by 3/23/2020, Motions due by 5/22/2020, Mediation Due by 4/22/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/26/2019. (gpre, ) Modified on 9/27/2019 to edit text (gpre, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc, filed by Kelly Kosek. Service due by 12/27/2019 (Arnold, Brian) Modified on 9/27/2019 to correct applicable party (gpre, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc. (Roth, Jonathan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kelly Kosek.(Arnold, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Greenville County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Roth, Jonathan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due no later than fourteen days after service of Notice of Removal. (gpre, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc.(gpre, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-23-4744. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8679157), filed by Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kosek v. Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Kosek
Represented By: Brian E Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive Automotive Industries of America Inc
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan A Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?