Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Future Income Payments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Defendant: PAS Northeast LLC, Pension Advance Midwest LLC, Future Income Payments LLC, Lumpsum Pension Advance Atlantic LLC, BuySellAnnuity Inc., Pension Advance Carolinas LLC, Pension Loans South LLC, PAS Southwest LLC, Lumpsum Settlement West LLC, Scott Kohn, Cash Flow Investment Partners East LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners LLC, FIP, LLC, Does 1-100, Lumpsum Pension Advance Southeast LLC, PAS Great Lakes LLC, PAS California LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners Mideast LLC and Pension Advance LLC
Not Yet Classified: Beattie B Ashmore
Case Number: 6:2019cv02950
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection re 65 Order,, (Hendricks, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 65 TEXT ORDER directing the Receiver, Beattie B. Ashmore, to submit a proposed Order. The Court, having received notice of transfer of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Future Income Payments, LLC, et al., No. 6:19-cv-2950-BHH to this Courts jurisdiction, hereby directs the Receiver, Beattie B. Ashmore, to submit for the Courts consideration a proposed order regarding his duties as Receiver pertaining to the transferred case. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/6/19. (alew, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leanne E. Hartmann by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hendricks, David) (Main Document 64 replaced on 12/6/2019) (alew, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/6/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 12/6/2019 to correct documents (alew, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection re #58 Notice of Appearance, #53 Order,, #32 Notice Other, #39 , #25 Response in Support of Motion, #52 Notice of Hearing, #20 Affidavit,, #22 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #30 Response in Support of Motion, #18 Reply,, #47 Notice Other, #48 Notice Other, #33 Response in Support of Motion, #31 Response in Support of Motion, #35 Notice Other, #26 Response in Support of Motion, #60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alanna B. Carbis , #21 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants, #28 Notice Other, #27 Response in Support of Motion, #55 Notice Other, #29 Response in Support of Motion, #37 , #41 Order on Motion to Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, #24 Response in Support of Motion, #34 Response in Support of Motion, #38 Affidavit, #59 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #23 Notice of Hearing, #19 , 43 Sealed Attachments D-H and U to the Declaration of Afsaneh Eghbaldari, 44 Sealed Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mansour Heidari, 45 Sealed Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of John Zelinsky (Hendricks, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 61 TEXT ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alanna B. Carbis for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/24/19.(alew, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alanna B. Carbis by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Response to Motion due by 11/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hendricks, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 59 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection.(Hendricks, David)
October 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Hendricks on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Hendricks, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 57 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #55 Notice Other placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Alanna Gayle Buchanan Carbis, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, 1700 G. Street, NW, Washington, DC 20552; Leanne E. Hartmann, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, 1700 G. Street, NW, Washington, DC 20552 (alew, ) Modified on 10/17/2019 (alew, ). **Counsel received notice via NEF.**
October 17, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Transfer from Central District of California. (alew, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:18-cv-01654. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) GRANTING Application to Transfer; and (2) DECLINING to Address and Vacating hearing on Applications for Entry of Default Judgment and for Appointment of Receiver (Doc. #21 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff's Application is GRANTED as to TRANSFER of this case to the District of South Carolina (Greenville Division). The Court declines to address the Applications for Entry of Default Judgment and for Appointment of Receiver. Such rulings may be made by the transferee court. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case transferred electronically. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Regarding Scott Kohn (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Sealed Document, 46 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #47 , Sealed Document, 42 , Sealed Document,, 43 , Sealed Document, 45 , Sealed Document, 44 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #48 served on September 9, 2019. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 51 SEALED - EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Former FIP Employee. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 50 SEALED - EXHIBITS 3 and EXHIBIT 4. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection of Exhibits 3 and 4 to Declaration of Mansour Heidari. (Hartmann, Leanne) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection of Exhibit A to Declaration of Former FIP Employee. (Hartmann, Leanne) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER (1) GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Seal (Docs. #19 , #37 ) and (2) GRANTING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Relief from the Service Requirement Under FRCP 5(A) and L.R. 79-5.3 (Doc. #39 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #38 , APPLICATION to file document Second Declaration of Former FIP Employee under seal #37 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(a) and L.R. 79-5.3 as to Service of Unredacted Documents #39 served on August 27, 2019. (Hartmann, Leanne) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 39 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(a) and L.R. 79-5.3 as to Service of Unredacted Documents filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leanne E. Hartmann in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Redacted Document Second Declaration of Former FIP Employee, #3 Proposed Order) (Hartmann, Leanne) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 38 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Second Declaration of Former FIP Employee under seal #37 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Second Declaration of Former FIP Employee)(Hartmann, Leanne) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 37 APPLICATION to file document Second Declaration of Former FIP Employee under seal filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartmann, Leanne) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Memorandum in Support of Motion, #22 , Declaration (Motion related) #30 , Declaration (Motion related) #34 , Declaration (Motion related), #25 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #28 , Notice of Lodging, #35 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #32 , APPLICATION to file document Portions of the Declaration of Former FIP Employee and Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits under seal #19 , Notice (Other) #23 , Declaration (Motion related) #27 , Declaration (Motion related), #29 , Declaration (Motion related), #24 , Declaration (Motion related), #33 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #20 , Declaration (Motion related), #26 , APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 , Declaration (Motion related) #31 served on August 21, 2019. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER, APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER, AND TRANSFER OF VENUE)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Carol Welborn in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Former FIP Employee in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exhibit A (Manually Filed))(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Former FIP Employee. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Roy Kindig in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Matthew Waldon in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Mansour Heidari in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 DECLARATION OF MANSOUR HEIDARI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR: (1) ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; (2) APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER; AND, (3) TRANSFER OF VENUE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-4)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection of EXHIBITS 3 AND 4 TO THE DECLARATION OF MANSOUR HEIDARI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR: (1) ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; (2) APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER; AND, (3) TRANSFER OF VENUE. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Frank Pack in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of John Zelinsky in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 DECLARATION OF JOHN ZELINSKY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR: (1) ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; (2) APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER; AND, (3) TRANSFER OF VENUE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-10)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Afsaneh Eghbaldari in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments A - C, #2 Redacted Document Attachments D - H, #3 Exhibit Attachments I - T, #4 Redacted Document Attachment U)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Alanna B. Carbis in support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 DECLARATION OF ALANNA B. CARBIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR: (1) ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; (2) APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER; AND, (3) TRANSFER OF VENUE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-27)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE Recommendation for the Appointment of a Receiver filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants #21 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR: (1) ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; (2) APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER; AND, (3) TRANSFER OF VENUE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants All Named Defendants filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Application set for hearing on 10/18/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of the Declaration of Former FIP Employee and Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits under seal #19 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Declaration of Former FIP Employee, #2 Unredacted Document Attachments D through H to the Declaration of Afsaneh Eghbaldari, #3 Unredacted Document Attachment U to the Declaration of Afsaneh Eghbaldari, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1 to the Heidari Declaration, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1 to the Zelinsky Declaration)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION to file document Portions of the Declaration of Former FIP Employee and Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Declaration of Former FIP Employee, #3 Redacted Document Attachments D through H to the Declaration of Afsaneh Eghbaldari, #4 Redacted Document Attachment U to the Declaration of Afsaneh Eghbaldari, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mansour Heidari, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of John Zelinsky)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protectionto Order to Show Cause, #17 (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ALANNA B. CARBIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION [ECF NO. 17])(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court hereby ORDERS plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than, 7/30/2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form,, #15 served on December 26, 2018. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendants Future Income Payments, LLC, FIP, LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners LLC, Pension Advance LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners East LLC; Cash Flow Investment Partners MidEast LLC; Lumpsum Pension Advance Atlantic LLC; Lumpsum Pension Advance Southeast LLC; Lumpsum Settlement West LLC; PAS California LLC; PAS Great Lakes LLC; PAS Northeast LLC; PAS Southwest LLC; Pension Advance Carolinas LLC; Pension Advance Midwest LLC; Pension Loans South LLC and Scott Kohn. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant BuySellAnnuity Inc., Cash Flow Investment Partners East LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners Mideast LLC, FIP, LLC, Future Income Payments, LLC, Scott Kohn, Lumpsum Pension Advance Atlantic LLC, Lumpsum Pension Advance Southeast LLC, Lumpsum Settlement West LLC, PAS California LLC, PAS Great Lakes LLC, PAS Northeast LLC, PAS Southwest LLC, Pension Advance Carolinas LLC, Pension Advance LLC, Pension Advance Midwest LLC, Pension Loans South LLC filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alanna Carbis in Support of Application for Default Against All Named Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 to Carbis Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Carbis Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Carbis Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Carbis Declaration) (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Waiver of Service Executed #12 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34), #10 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on October 22, 2018. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Scott Kohn. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV17-00303 JLS( SSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-01654 JLS (SSx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (dv) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BuySellAnnuity Inc., Cash Flow Investment Partners East LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners LLC, Cash Flow Investment Partners Mideast LLC, FIP, LLC, Future Income Payments, LLC, Scott Kohn, Lumpsum Pension Advance Atlantic LLC, Lumpsum Pension Advance Southeast LLC, Lumpsum Settlement West LLC, PAS California LLC, PAS Great Lakes LLC, PAS Northeast LLC, PAS Southwest LLC, Pension Advance Carolinas LLC, Pension Advance LLC, Pension Advance Midwest LLC, Pension Loans South LLC. (es) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attorney Alanna Gayle Buchanan Carbis added to party Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection(pty:pla))(Carbis, Alanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Future Income Payments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAS Northeast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Advance Midwest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Income Payments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumpsum Pension Advance Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BuySellAnnuity Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Advance Carolinas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Loans South LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAS Southwest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumpsum Settlement West LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash Flow Investment Partners East LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash Flow Investment Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumpsum Pension Advance Southeast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAS Great Lakes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAS California LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash Flow Investment Partners Mideast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Advance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Represented By: Alanna Gayle Buchanan Carbis
Represented By: Leanne E Hartmann
Represented By: David Michael Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Beattie B Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?