Farmer v. Allergan Inc
Plaintiff: Joseph Farmer
Defendant: Allergan Inc and Allergan USA Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv03025
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph Farmer.(Dickey, Joseph)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/09/19.(ctuc, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/09/19. (ctuc, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/09/19.(ctuc, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/29/20, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 4/28/20, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/15/20, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/15/20, Mediation Due by 6/22/20, Discovery due by 6/29/20, Motions due by 7/20/20, Jury Selection Deadline 10/2/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/09/19. (ctuc, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Allergan USA Inc.(Wilson, Sandi)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Allergan USA Inc. and Joseph Farmer. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Wilson, Sandi) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Allergan USA Inc. and Joseph Farmer Response to Motion due by 12/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Wilson, Sandi) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Allergan USA Inc. and Joseph Farmer (Wilson, Sandi) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Allergan USA Inc., Joseph Farmer(Wilson, Sandi) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 5/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/15/19. (kmca)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/5/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/19/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 12/19/2019, ADR/Mediaiton Statement due by 12/19/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/29/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/28/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/30/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/30/2020, Discovery due by 4/29/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/3/2020 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/15/19. (kmca)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Allergan USA Inc.(Okeke, Cashida) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/14/2019: to replace with corrected document (typo) as requested by and provided by filing user) (kmca).
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allergan Inc, filed by Joseph Farmer. Service due by 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Notice of Right To Sue) (Dickey, Joseph)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph Farmer.(Dickey, Joseph)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 11/8/2019. (abuc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allergan Inc.(abuc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-04130. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8742173), filed by Allergan Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Allergan Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Farmer
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc
Represented By: Cashida Okeke
Represented By: Sandi R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA Inc
Represented By: Cashida Okeke
Represented By: Sandi R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?