James Van Connor v. Foresters Financial Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Van Connor
Defendant: One Life America Inc and Foresters Financial Services Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv03283
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/18/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/19/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/26/2020, Discovery due by 11/3/2020, Mediation Due by 12/18/2020. All other deadlines as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/14/20. (alew, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by James Van Connor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Maxfield, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Foresters Financial Services Inc.(Devlin, Chadwick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Foresters Financial Services Inc.(Devlin, Chadwick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/19/19. (alew, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/9/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/23/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/23/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/13/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/15/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/15/2020, Discovery due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 7/15/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/13/2020, Mediation Due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/19/19. (alew, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by One Life America Inc.(Watson, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by One Life America Inc.(Watson, Joseph)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Van Connor. Foresters Financial Services Inc served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Foresters Financial Services, Inc.)(Maxfield, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Van Connor. One Life America Inc served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of One Life America, Inc.)(Maxfield, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony Paronich for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/25/19.(alew, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Paronich ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8794792) by James Van Connor. Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, Anthony Paronich, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, Anthony Paronich, #3 Proposed Order Anthony Paronich, PHV)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Maxfield, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Foresters Financial Services Inc, One Life America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons One Life America Inc)(alew, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Van Connor.(alew, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Foresters Financial Services Inc, One Life America Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8791175.), filed by James Van Connor. Service due by 2/19/2020(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Van Connor v. Foresters Financial Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Life America Inc
Represented By: Christopher Lee Boguski
Represented By: Joseph Calhoun Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foresters Financial Services Inc
Represented By: Chadwick S Devlin
Represented By: Don Lawrence Kristinik, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Van Connor
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Represented By: Anthony I Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?