Tucker v. House of Raeford Farms Inc et al
Plaintiff: April E Tucker
Defendant: Caroline Andrews, House of Raeford Farms Inc, Jacyn Miller and Hannah Cagle
Case Number: 6:2019cv03511
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #20 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to April E Tucker 108 West Avenue Greenville, SC 29611 (gpre, )
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have through February 24, 2020, in which to fileher response to the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is advised that if she fails to respond, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), and for failure to comply with this Courts orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/3/2020. (gpre, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to April E Tucker 108 West Avenue Greenville, SC 29611 (gpre, )
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim due by 1/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/26/2019. (gpre, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 14 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to April E Tucker 108 West Avenue Greenville, SC 29611 (gpre, )
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rhonda Lynn Klein for House of Raeford Farms Inc, Hannah Cagle, Jacyn Miller, Caroline Andrews. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/26/2019.(gpre, )
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice James W. Wimberly Jr. to represent House of Raeford Farms Inc, Hannah Cagle, Jacyn Miller, Carolina Andrews. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/26/2019.(gpre, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Caroline Andrews, Hannah Cagle, House of Raeford Farms Inc, Jacyn Miller. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cagle Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exh.-Cagle Deposition, #3 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Daniels, M)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rhonda L. Klein ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8845989) by Caroline Andrews, Hannah Cagle, House of Raeford Farms Inc, Jacyn Miller. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV App & CGS, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Daniels, M)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James W. Wimberly, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8845976) by Caroline Andrews, Hannah Cagle, House of Raeford Farms Inc, Jacyn Miller. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV App & CGS, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Daniels, M)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, Pro Se 26.01 interrogatories, Public Docket Report, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to April E Tucker 108 West Avenue Greenville, SC 29611 (gpre, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Defendants paid filing fee $400 (receipt number 0420-8834041). Pro Se party's answers to Rule 26.01 interrogatories due by 1/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)(gpre, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (gpre, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Caroline Andrews, Hannah Cagle, House of Raeford Farms Inc, Jacyn Miller.(gpre, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-23-cp-06586. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8834041), filed by Hannah Cagle, Caroline Andrews, House of Raeford Farms Inc, Jacyn Miller. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Documents)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. House of Raeford Farms Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Andrews
Represented By: M Lee Daniels, Jr
Represented By: James W Wimberly, Jr
Represented By: Rhonda Lynn Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Raeford Farms Inc
Represented By: M Lee Daniels, Jr
Represented By: James W Wimberly, Jr
Represented By: Rhonda Lynn Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacyn Miller
Represented By: M Lee Daniels, Jr
Represented By: James W Wimberly, Jr
Represented By: Rhonda Lynn Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Cagle
Represented By: M Lee Daniels, Jr
Represented By: James W Wimberly, Jr
Represented By: Rhonda Lynn Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April E Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?