Maddonna v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Aimee Maddonna
Defendant: Michael Leach, Administration for Children and Families, Lynn Johnson, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M Azar, II and Henry McMaster
Case Number: 6:2019cv03551
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Leach.(Woodington, Kenneth)
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Leach. Response to Motion due by 2/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry McMaster.(Coleman, Miles)
February 11, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Henry McMaster. Response to Motion due by 2/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Gov. McMaster to Steven Wagner, #2 Exhibit B: Executive Order 2018-12, #3 Exhibit C: letter from Steven Wagner to Gov. McMaster.)No proposed order.(Coleman, Miles)
February 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Paul Woodington on behalf of Michael Leach (Woodington, Kenneth)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Henry McMaster answer due 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's agreement to extension of time pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.01)(Coleman, Miles)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Maddonna. Administration for Children and Families served on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Alex M Azar, II served on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Lynn Johnson served on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Proof of Service)(Kozloski, Aaron)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Maddonna. Michael Leach served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020; Henry McMaster served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Proof of Service)(Kozloski, Aaron)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/8/2020.(abuc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth D. Upton, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8865995) by Aimee Maddonna. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kozloski, Aaron)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from Case Number 6:19-cv-03551-TMC and 6:19-cv-01567-TMC to 6:19-cv-03551-DCC and 6:19-cv-01567-DCC. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-03551-DCC, 6:19-cv-01567-DCC(abuc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Timothy M Cain no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard B. Katskee, Sarah R. Goetz for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/30/19.(alew, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah R. Goetz ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8851915) by Aimee Maddonna. Response to Motion due by 1/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Kozloski, Aaron)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard B. Katskee ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8851890) by Aimee Maddonna. Response to Motion due by 1/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Kozloski, Aaron)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Administration for Children and Families, Alex M Azar, II, Lynn Johnson, Michael Leach, Henry McMaster, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (kmca)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aimee Maddonna.(kmca)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administration for Children and Families, Alex M Azar, II; Lynn Johnson, Michael Leach, Henry McMaster, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8842264), filed by Aimee Maddonna. Service due by 3/19/2020.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddonna v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Leach
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry McMaster
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Represented By: Jay Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Miles Edward Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Maddonna
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr
Represented By: Richard B Katskee
Represented By: Sarah Ruth Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?