Carman v. HealthPro Heritage LLC
Plaintiff: Ryan Carman
Defendant: HealthPro Heritage LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00232
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 17 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/16/20. (kmca)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/6/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/20/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 4/20/2020, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 4/20/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/1/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/31/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/31/2020, Discovery due by 8/31/2020, Motions due by 9/14/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 12/7/2020 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/16/20. (kmca)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by HealthPro Heritage LLC.(Lehrer, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HealthPro Heritage LLC.(Lehrer, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #9 Acceptance of Service. Reason: attorney re-filed corrected document (signed cover page) using correct event. Corrected Filing Document Number #10 Summons Returned Executed. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 2/4/20. (kmca)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Carman. HealthPro Heritage LLC served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Christian, Joshua) Modified on 2/5/2020: to correct date filed; to add text (served & answer dates) (kmca).
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joshua D Christian for March 5, 2020 through March 16, 2020 (Christian, Joshua)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Don J Foty added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/29/20.(kmca)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Don J. Foty ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8910227) by Ryan Carman. Response to Motion due by 2/11/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for Admission to Practice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Supporting Documents Supreme Court of Texas Certificate)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Christian, Joshua)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HealthPro Heritage LLC. (kmca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ryan Carman.(kmca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Collective Action and Class Action Complaint against HealthPro Heritage LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8901437), filed by Ryan Carman. Service due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Joint Collective Action.)(kmca) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/24/2020: to replace with corrected signature (pro hac vice) as provided by filing user). Modified on 1/24/2020: to add description to Exhibit A as provided by filing user (kmca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carman v. HealthPro Heritage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Carman
Represented By: Joshua D Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthPro Heritage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?