Goodwin v. In and Out Bail Bonds et al
Plaintiff: Willie Goodwin
Defendant: Palmetto Surety Corporation, United States of America Probation Office, In and Out Bail Bonds, FNU Guarionex and USAA Insurance
Case Number: 6:2020cv02143
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Willie Goodwin 33018-171 Edgefield Federal Correctional Institution Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. Box 725 Edgefield, SC 29824 with blank complaint, blank summons, blank financial certificate, blank AO240; 6 blank USM285 forms (kric, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 7/17/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/26/20. (ctuc, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson. (kric, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Willie Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Guarionex, In and Out Bail Bonds, Palmetto Surety Corporation, USAA Insurance, United States of America Probation Office, filed by Willie Goodwin. There was no complaint form received. Service due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, ) Modified on 6/9/2020 to edit filing date (kric, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. In and Out Bail Bonds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto Surety Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In and Out Bail Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Guarionex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?