Ashmore v. Bell
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Defendant: Debra Bell
Case Number: 6:2020cv02644
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beattie B Ashmore. Debra Bell served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Proof of Service)(Tollison, Lewis)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Debra Bell. (alew, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Beattie B Ashmore.(alew, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Debra Bell ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222724.), filed by Beattie B Ashmore. Service due by 10/14/2020(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmore v. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Represented By: Thomas Edward Vanderbloemen
Represented By: Lauren S Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?