Peay and Associates LLC v. First Community Bank et al
Plaintiff: Peay and Associates LLC
Defendant: TD Bank NA, Amy Brinkley, Michael Crapps, H Lynn Harton, First Citizens Bank, United Community Bank Inc, Americas Most Convenient Bank, First Community Bank and Frank B Holding, Jr
Case Number: 6:2020cv02651
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0636
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peay and Associates LLC (Fickling, Jessica)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Leonid Traps added for Defendants Amy Brinkley and TD Bank NA. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 9/8/20.(kmca)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leonid Traps ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9326649) by Amy Brinkley, TD Bank NA. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leonid Traps)No proposed order.(McGee, Thomas)
August 18, 2020 Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due due thirty (30) days after the Court issues an Order regarding the #18 MOTION to Remand. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/18/20.(kmca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION byAmy Brinkley, Michael Crapps, First Citizens Bank, First Community Bank, H Lynn Harton, Frank B Holding, Jr, TD Bank NA, United Community Bank Inc re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, . (McGee, Thomas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Amy Brinkley, Michael Crapps, First Citizens Bank, First Community Bank, H Lynn Harton, Frank B Holding, Jr, TD Bank NA, United Community Bank Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smith, Benjamin) Modified on 8/17/2020: see #31 Consultation Certificate (kmca).
August 7, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Review Response filed by Amy Brinkley, Michael Crapps, First Citizens Bank, First Community Bank, H Lynn Harton, Frank B Holding, Jr, TD Bank NA, United Community Bank Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/14/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agent Fee Cases Currently Pending in Federal Court)(McGee, Thomas) Modified on 8/7/2020: to add text (joint) (kmca).
July 30, 2020 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jang H Jo added for defendants First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 7/30/20.(kmca)
July 30, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jang H. Jo ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9249336) by First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr. Response to Motion due by 8/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jang H. Jo ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ries, Addie)
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Clifton L Brinson and Michael W Mitchell added for defendants First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 7/30/20.(kmca)
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael W. Mitchell ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9243646) by First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr. Response to Motion due by 8/11/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Application of Michael W. Mitchell ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ries, Addie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2020: to replace with corrected document (typo) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clifton L. Brinson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9243600) by First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr. Response to Motion due by 8/11/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Clifton L. Brinson ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ries, Addie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Peay and Associates LLC.(Fickling, Jessica)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand and MOTION for Expedited Review by Peay and Associates LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Ex 1 - First Amended Summons and Complaint)No proposed order.(Fickling, Jessica). Added MOTION for Expedited Review on 7/24/2020: to add additional relief as listed (kmca).
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Joint Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1-2] Amended Complaint. Amy Brinkley answer due 8/24/2020; Michael Crapps answer due 8/24/2020; First Citizens Bank answer due 8/24/2020; First Community Bank answer due 8/24/2020; H Lynn Harton answer due 8/24/2020; Frank B Holding, Jr answer due 8/24/2020; TD Bank NA answer due 8/24/2020; United Community Bank Inc answer due 8/24/2020. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 7/22/20.(kmca)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amy Brinkley, TD Bank NA, First Community Bank, Michael Crapps, First Citizens Bank, Frank B. Holding Jr, United Community Banks Inc, H Lynn Harton. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McGee, Thomas) Modified on 7/22/2020: to add joint filers as listed (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Amy Brinkley, TD Bank NA.(McGee, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020: to correct filing date (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Thomas William McGee, III on behalf of Amy Brinkley, TD Bank NA (McGee, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020: to correct filing date (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas William McGee, III on behalf of Amy Brinkley, TD Bank NA (McGee, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020: to correct filing date (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Crapps, First Community Bank.(Manning, Cory) Modified on 7/20/2020: to correct filing date (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Cory E Manning on behalf of Michael Crapps, First Community Bank (Manning, Cory) Modified on 7/20/2020: to correct filing date (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory E Manning on behalf of Michael Crapps, First Community Bank (Manning, Cory) Modified on 7/20/2020: to correct filing date (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr.(Ries, Addie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Addie K S Ries on behalf of First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr (Ries, Addie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Addie K S Ries on behalf of First Citizens Bank, Frank B Holding, Jr (Ries, Addie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by H Lynn Harton, United Community Bank Inc.(kmca)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Laurens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-30-00508. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9223727), filed by United Community Bank Inc, H Lynn Harton. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Georgia SOS Business Information, #4 Exhibit D - Chart of calculations of agent fees, #5 Exhibit E - Chart of calculations of lender fees, #6 Certificate of Service)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peay and Associates LLC v. First Community Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank NA
Represented By: Thomas William McGee, III
Represented By: Leonid Traps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Brinkley
Represented By: Thomas William McGee, III
Represented By: Leonid Traps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Crapps
Represented By: Cory E Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Lynn Harton
Represented By: Carmen Harper Thomas
Represented By: Benjamin Rush Smith, III
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Citizens Bank
Represented By: Addie K S Ries
Represented By: Clifton L Brinson
Represented By: Jang Hwan Jo
Represented By: Michael W Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Community Bank Inc
Represented By: Carmen Harper Thomas
Represented By: Benjamin Rush Smith, III
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americas Most Convenient Bank
Represented By: Thomas William McGee, III
Represented By: Leonid Traps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank
Represented By: Cory E Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank B Holding, Jr
Represented By: Addie K S Ries
Represented By: Clifton L Brinson
Represented By: Jang Hwan Jo
Represented By: Michael W Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peay and Associates LLC
Represented By: Algernon Gibson Solomons, III
Represented By: Daniel Alvah Speights
Represented By: Joseph Preston Strom, Jr
Represented By: Jessica Lerer Fickling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?