Williams v. Schuring
Plaintiff: Barbara Williams
Defendant: Tye Edward Schuring
Case Number: 6:2020cv02898
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/10/2020, ADR Statement/Certification due by 11/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2021, Discovery due by 3/22/2021, Motions due by 4/5/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/7/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tye Edward Schuring.(Still, Patrick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tye Edward Schuring.(Still, Patrick)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Williams. Tye Edward Schuring served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tye Edward Schuring. (kmca)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Barbara Williams.(kmca)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tye Edward Schuring (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9270743), filed by Barbara Williams. Service due by 11/9/2020.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Schuring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Williams
Represented By: James Camden Hodge
Represented By: Amanda Ruth Itterly
Represented By: Kevin B Smith
Represented By: Roy T Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tye Edward Schuring
Represented By: Patrick Laverne Still, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?