Blakney v. Darlington County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Larry Blakney
Defendant: Catherine Brewton, Darlington County Detention Center, Hartsville Police Department, Cat and Shawn Hey
Case Number: 6:2020cv02964
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Blakney 34750-171 Butner Federal Medical Center Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. Box 1600 Butner, NC 27509 with blank summons and 4 USM285 forms as directed (kric, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/5/2020. (kric, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry Blakney. Address updated. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Blakney 34750-171 Miami Federal Detention Center Inmate Mail/Parcels PO Box 019120 Miami, FL 33101 with blank summons and USM285 forms as directed. (kric, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 9/18/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/28/20. (ctuc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (kric, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Larry Blakney. Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Larry Blakney. Service due by 11/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakney v. Darlington County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Brewton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlington County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartsville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Hey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Blakney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?