Maklin v. Greenville County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Otis James Maklin and Otis James Macklin, Jr
Defendant: Greenville County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 6:2020cv02967
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, 7 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Otis James Macklin, Jr Lexington Federal Medical Center Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. Box 14500 Lexington, KY 40512 with blank complaint, AO240 application, Financial Certificate, summons and USM285 forms as directed. (kric, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time. On August 25, 2020, the undersigned issued an order informing the plaintiff that his case was not in proper form for review and providing the plaintiff with twenty-one (21) days to bring his case into proper form (doc. 4). Instead of submitting the necessary documents, the plaintiff filed a motion on September 17, 2020, seeking sixty additional days to bring his case into proper form (doc. 6). The plaintiff's request is granted-in-part, and the plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date this order is entered to bring this case into proper form. No further extensions will be granted. If the plaintiff does not bring this case into proper form by the time permitted by this order, this case will be forwarded to the assigned United States District Judge with a recommendation that it be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with an order of this Court under Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Out of an abundance of caution for the pro se plaintiff, the Clerk of Court is directed to mail the plaintiff another copy of the court's August 25, 2020, order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/22/20.(ctuc, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by Otis James Macklin, Jr. Response to Motion due by 10/1/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(gpre, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Otis James Macklin, Jr Lexington Federal Medical Center Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. Box 14500 Lexington, KY 40512 with blank complaint, IFP Application, Financial Certificate, Summons, 2 USM285 forms (kric, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 9/15/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/25/20. (ctuc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (kric, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greenville County Sheriff's Department, filed by Otis James Maklin. Service due by 11/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maklin v. Greenville County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis James Maklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis James Macklin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?