U.S. Bank National Association v. International Palm Oil & Biodesiel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Mark Day, Carter Lumber of the South, Inc. and International Palm Oil & Biodesiel, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv03543
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 7 Transfer of Case Management, #5 Order, Public Docket Sheet, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Mark Day 944 Dexter Ave. Aiken, SC 29801 (rweb, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Timothy M Cain. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address:300 East Washington Street Greenville, SC 29601. (rweb, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the case be REMANDED to the Greenville County Court of Common Pleas. Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/20/20. (rweb, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to pro se defendant. Defendant Day has paid the full filing fee of $400 (receipt number SCX600008713). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/20/20. (rweb, ) Modified on 10/21/2020 to edit text; add receipt number (gpre, ).
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-23-03410. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX600008713), filed by Mark Day. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, # (3 ) Envelope) (rweb, ) Modified on 10/20/2020 to correct filers (rweb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. International Palm Oil & Biodesiel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Lumber of the South, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Palm Oil & Biodesiel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: January N Taylor
Represented By: J Pamela Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?