United States of America v. Blackston et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Greenville County Office of the Tax Collector, Barry C Blackston doing business as Greenville Internal Medicine, Barry C Blackston, Cryptomaria LLC, SC Department of Employment and Workforce, GIM Barry Blackston MD PA and Maree Blackston
Case Number: 6:2020cv04023
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #11 Waiver of Service Executed, #13 Waiver of Service Executed, #10 Waiver of Service Executed, #12 Waiver of Service Executed (Sneed, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #16 Scheduling Order,, #17 Pretrial Order,, Set Hearings, (Sneed, Robert) (Main Document 18 replaced on 1/13/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 1/13/2021 to replace with corrected document per attorney request (alew, ).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING ORDER Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Tuesday, 2/16/2021 11:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/11/21. (alew, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 16 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/29/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/21/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/21/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/10/2021, Discovery due by 7/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 9/8/2021, Motions due by 7/26/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/17/2021, Bench Trial Deadline 10/8/2021, Mediation Due by 8/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/11/21. (alew, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #13 Waiver of Service Executed (Sneed, Robert) (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/13/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 1/13/2021 to replace with corrected document per attorney request (alew, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #11 Waiver of Service Executed, #10 Waiver of Service Executed, #12 Waiver of Service Executed (Sneed, Robert) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/13/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 1/13/2021 to replace with corrected document per attorney request (alew, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. Maree Blackston waiver executed on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Sneed, Robert) Modified on 1/11/2021 to correct service and answer deadlines (alew, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Sneed, Robert)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. GIM Barry Blackston MD PA waiver executed on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Sneed, Robert) Modified on 1/11/2021 to correct service and answer deadlines (alew, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. Barry C Blackston waiver executed on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Sneed, Robert) Modified on 1/11/2021 to correct service and answer deadlines (alew, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greenville County Office of the Tax Collector.(Wile, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greenville County Office of the Tax Collector.(Wile, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SC Department of Employment and Workforce.(alew, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SC Department of Employment and Workforce. (Jordan, Steven) Modified on 1/4/2021 to remove incorrectly attached Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories (alew, ).
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. Cryptomaria LLC waiver executed on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (Sneed, Robert) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/8/2020) (alew, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2020: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (alew, ). Modified on 12/8/2020 to add corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ).
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Barry C Blackston, #2 Summons Barry C Blackston d/b/a Greenville Internal Medicine, #3 Summons GIM Barry Blackston, MD, PA, #4 Summons Greenville County, Office of the Tax Collector, #5 Summons SC Department of Employment, #6 Summons Cryptomaria LLC)(alew, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(alew, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 2/16/2021(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Blackston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville County Office of the Tax Collector
Represented By: Jeffrey D Wile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry C Blackston doing business as Greenville Internal Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry C Blackston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cryptomaria LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Department of Employment and Workforce
Represented By: Steven Alderman Jordan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIM Barry Blackston MD PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maree Blackston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert M Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?