Kennedy et al v. Monroe Group Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Cierria Jenkins, Cassondra Grayson, Tawanda Woody, Tyneshia Dodd and Tashia Kennedy
Defendant: Steele Belle Meade LLC, Monroe Group Ltd and Vernice Dimiati
Case Number: 6:2021cv01168
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Tuesday, 7/13/21 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/9/21. (alew, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/29/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/23/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/17/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/18/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/8/2021, Discovery due by 12/6/2021, Motion in Limine due by 2/4/2022, Motions due by 12/20/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/14/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 3/7/2022, Mediation Due by 1/3/2022. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/9/21. (alew, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Vernice Dimiati, Monroe Group Ltd, Steele Belle Meade LLC.(Speer, R)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vernice Dimiati, Monroe Group Ltd, Steele Belle Meade LLC.(Speer, R) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/3/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 6/3/2021 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ).
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tashia Kennedy, Cierria Jenkins, Tyneshia Dodd, Cassondra Grayson, Tawanda Woody. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service (Monroe Group Ltd), #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service (Steele Belle Meade, LLC), #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service (Vernice Dimiati))(Schanen, Giles)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Steele Belle Meade LLC answer due 6/2/2021; Monroe Group Ltd answer due 6/2/2021; Vernice Dimiati answer due 6/2/2021. (Stetson, Hannah)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vernice Dimiati, Monroe Group Ltd, Steele Belle Meade LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Steele Belle Meade LLC, #2 Summons Vernice Dimiati)(alew, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tyneshia Dodd, Cassondra Grayson, Cierria Jenkins, Tashia Kennedy, Tawanda Woody.(alew, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9787917.), filed by Tashia Kennedy, Cierria Jenkins, Tyneshia Dodd, Cassondra Grayson, Tawanda Woody. Service due by 7/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-Tenant Selection Plan ("TSP"), #3 Exhibit B-House Rules, #4 Exhibit C-Belle Meade Apartments Tenant Application (Rev.02-01-2019), #5 Exhibit D-Generic 30-day Notice letter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-September 10, 2019 30-day Notice to Tashia Kennedy, #7 Exhibit F-LeasingDesk Screening Report for Tashia Kennedy and her son, #8 Exhibit G-November 11, 2019 letter to Resident from Defendants, #9 Exhibit H-December 9, 2019 email from Kyle Martin to Charlotte Osmer, #10 Exhibit I-September 10, 2019 30-day Notice Letter to Tawanda Woody, #11 Exhibit J-LeasingDesk Screening Report for Tawanda Woody and her son, #12 Exhibit K-September 10, 2019 30-day Notice Letter to Tyneshia Dodd, #13 Exhibit L-LeasingDesk Screening Report for Tyneshia Dodd, #14 Exhibit M-September 10, 2019 30-day Notice Letter to Cierria Jenkins, #15 Exhibit N-September 13, 2019 letter to Cierria Jenkins from Belle Meade, #16 Exhibit O-LeasingDesk Screening Report for Cierria Jenkins, #17 Exhibit P-Court records for Jenkins re: fine pursuant to S.C.Code 17-25-130, #18 Exhibit Q-November 2, 2015 HUD Notice PIH 2015-19, #19 Exhibit R-April 4, 2016 HUD Office of General Counsel Guidance re: Use of Criminal Records)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy et al v. Monroe Group Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steele Belle Meade LLC
Represented By: Hannah Davis Stetson
Represented By: Reginald W Belcher
Represented By: R Taylor Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Group Ltd
Represented By: Hannah Davis Stetson
Represented By: Reginald W Belcher
Represented By: R Taylor Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernice Dimiati
Represented By: Hannah Davis Stetson
Represented By: Reginald W Belcher
Represented By: R Taylor Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cierria Jenkins
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Elizabeth Cameron Edmondson
Represented By: Charlotte Osmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassondra Grayson
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Elizabeth Cameron Edmondson
Represented By: Charlotte Osmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanda Woody
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Elizabeth Cameron Edmondson
Represented By: Charlotte Osmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyneshia Dodd
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Elizabeth Cameron Edmondson
Represented By: Charlotte Osmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashia Kennedy
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Elizabeth Cameron Edmondson
Represented By: Charlotte Osmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?