Parker v. Continental Finance Company et al
Plaintiff: Darion E. Parker
Defendant: Celtic Bank Corp. and Continental Finance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv01886
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation by Darion E. Parker. Reply to Objections due by 7/29/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sgri)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Darion E. Parker 606 Bryson Drive Simpsonville, SC 29681 (sgri)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Timothy M. Cain. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 300 E. Washington St. Greenville, SC 29601. (sgri)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 ORDER, #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 9 TEXT Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Darion E. Parker 606 Bryson Drive Simpsonville, SC 29681 (sgri)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 complaint. This action should be dismissed without issuance and service of process for failure to state a claim. Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 6/29/2021. (sgri)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 6/29/2021. (sgri)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 6/30/2021. (sgri)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Darion E. Parker. (sgri)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Darion E. Parker. Response to Motion due by 7/6/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D. Austin. (sgri)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celtic Bank Corp., Continental Finance Company, filed by Darion E. Parker. Service due by 9/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Continental Finance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Finance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darion E. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?