Johnson v. Stirling et al
Plaintiff: Alvin Johnson
Defendant: Bryan Stirling, C Livingston, R Bailey, Z. Ramp and K Brown
Case Number: 6:2021cv03331
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Alvin Johnson 245448 Broad River Correctional Institution Murrow-A-254 4460 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 with complaint form, IFP Application, Financial Certificate, Summons, and USM285 forms (kric, )
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/17/2021. (kric, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Alvin Johnson 245448 Broad River Correctional Institution Murrow-A-254 4460 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 with blank complaint, IPF Application, Financial Certificate, Summons and 5 USM285 forms (kric, )
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/18/2021. (kric, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (kric, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alvin Johnson. Service due by 1/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Prisoners and Advocates United for Human Rights, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Ramp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?