Hillerby v. Nelson
Petitioner: Justin Hillerby
Respondent: Kenneth Nelson
Case Number: 6:2021cv03450
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 the respondent's consent motion for 30-day extension of time until January 12, 2022, to make return or otherwise plead. IT IS SO GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/9/2021.(kric, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Kenneth Nelson. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Battenfield, Julianna)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna Battenfield on behalf of Kenneth Nelson (Battenfield, Julianna)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Salter, III on behalf of Kenneth Nelson (Salter, William)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Kenneth Nelson. (Brown, Melody)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER authorizing service of process. Apprising the respondents of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 12/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(kric, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (kric, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt number 0420-10139074.), filed by Justin Hillerby.(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillerby v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Hillerby
Represented By: William Glenn Yarborough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Nelson
Represented By: Julianna Battenfield
Represented By: William Edgar Salter, III
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?