Banner v. Tisdale et al
Plaintiff: Genuine Truth Banner
Defendant: Mr Tisdale, Mr Settles, Officer Davis, Officer Burley and Mrs Tucker
Case Number: 6:2021cv03456
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Genuine Truth Banner. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Genuine Truth Banner. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Genuine Truth Banner 375165 Kirkland Correctional Institution MSU-6 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 (kric, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time. On November 22, 2021, the plaintiff filed a motion seeking additional time to bring his case into proper form. The plaintiff's proper form deadline is extended to 12/13/21. The plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to bring this case into proper form within the time permitted by this order, this case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with an order of this court under Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/23/2021.(kric, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to bring case into proper form by Genuine Truth Banner. Response to Motion due by 12/6/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2021: #1 Envelope) (kric, ).
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #7 Proper Form Order and AO 440 placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Genuine Truth Banner 375165 Kirkland Correctional Institution MSU-6 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 (sgri)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/17/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/27/2021. (sgri)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number SCX600008994 (sgri)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (kric, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Genuine Truth Banner. Service due by 1/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banner v. Tisdale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genuine Truth Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Settles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?