United States of America v. 99980 dollars in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 99980 dollars in US Currency
Case Number: 6:2022cv00445
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date March 16, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $99,980 dollars in US Currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem)(Sherard, Carrie)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED. (kmca)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (kmca)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 99980 dollars in US Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Task Force Officer Brett RaVell)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 99980 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99980 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?