Smith v. South Carolina Dept of Corrections, The
Plaintiff: Khammesherma Smith and Khamesher Maa
Defendant: South Carolina Dept of Corrections, The
Case Number: 6:2022cv01433
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Khammesherma Smith 378685 Kershaw Correctional Institution Cypress 3B 4848 Goldmine Highway Kershaw, SC 29067 with previously received USM285 form (kric, ) Modified on 6/14/2022 to edit text (kric, ).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 6/24/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/14/2022. (kric, )
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from Khammesherma Smith. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Victims, #2 Envelope)(kric, )
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Khammesherma Smith 378685 Kershaw Correctional Institution Cypress 3B 4848 Goldmine Highway Kershaw, SC 29067 with previously received USM285 form for date and signature (kric, )
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 5/17/2022.(kric, )
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 6/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 2) is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 5/17/2022. (kric, )
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Letter to Judge Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (kric, )
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Khammesherma Smith. Response to Motion due by 5/18/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against South Carolina Dept of Corrections, The, filed by Khammesherma Smith. Service due by 8/2/2022 See Additional Attachments #6 (kric, ) Modified on 5/9/2022 to edit text (kric, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. South Carolina Dept of Corrections, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khammesherma Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khamesher Maa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Dept of Corrections, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?