Scott v. Cohen et al
Plaintiff: Gary Steven Scott
Defendant: LeVern Cohen, Dr Alden and Trenton Smith
Case Number: 6:2022cv01811
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation by Gary Steven Scott. Reply to Objections due by 7/25/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(rweb, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order, #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Gary Steven Scott placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Gary Steven Scott 282106 McCormick Correctional Institution F4A-181 386 Redemption Way McCormick, SC 29899 (kric, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gary Steven Scott. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 2) be denied. Should the United States District Judge assigned to this case adopt this recommendation, it is recommended that the plaintiff be provided twenty-one (21) days to pay the filing fee or the case will be dismissed Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/22/2022. (kric, )
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/21/2022. (kric, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Beaufort. (kric, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Gary Steven Scott. Response to Motion due by 6/22/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary Steven Scott. Service due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Cohen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Steven Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeVern Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Alden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?