Gazich v. State of South Carolina
Plaintiff: Michael Gazich
Defendant: State of South Carolina
Case Number: 6:2023cv04682
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Michael Gazich. Document Returned: #18 Judgment, #17 Order on Report and Recommendation. (pbri, )
October 26, 2023 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #18 Judgment, #17 Order on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Michael Gazich #1017, Greenville County Detention Center, 20 McGee Street, Greenville, SC 29601. (pbri, )
October 26, 2023 Filing 18 JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice. (pbri, )
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting #11 Report and Recommendations. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/26/23.(pbri, )
October 23, 2023 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation by Michael Gazich. Reply to Objections due by 11/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pbri, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #9 Proper Form Order, 10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Complaint, IFP application, Financial Certificate, 1 Summons, and 1 USM form placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Michael Gazich 1017, Greenville County Detention Center, 20 McGee Street, Greenville, SC 29601. (pbri, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending denying re #2 MOTION to relieve counsel, and denying #3 MOTION for a hearing. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/4/23. (pbri, ) Modified on 10/6/2023: to edit text (relieve counsel) (kmca).
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/4/23.(pbri, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/25/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/4/23. (pbri, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. First attachment description: Re: warrant. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(pbri, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Gazich. See #8 additional attachments. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope, #3 Supporting documents) No proposed order. Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(pbri, ) Modified on 10/2/2023 to reference #8 additional attachments (pbri, ).
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Second Writ of Certiorari. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Supporting documents)(pbri, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2023: #3 Envelope) (pbri, ).
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (pbri, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION to Relieve Counsel by Michael Gazich. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(pbri, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Relieve Counsel by Michael Gazich. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(pbri, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of South Carolina filed by Michael Gazich. Service due by 12/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(pbri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gazich v. State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gazich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?