Dollar v. KYOCERA AVX Components Corporation
Plaintiff: Donald Dollar
Defendant: KYOCERA AVX Components Corporation
Case Number: 6:2023cv06087
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel in case 6:23-cv-06087-BHH; granting (5) Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel in case 6:23-cv-06332-BHH as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/18/24.Associated Cases: 6:23-cv-06087-BHH, 6:23-cv-06332-BHH(alew)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel by Donald Dollar. Response to Motion due by 1/31/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memo (Milberg Resume), #3 Exhibit B to Memo (Chesnut Cambronne Resume), #4 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Segui, Harper)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dollar. KYOCERA AVX Components Corporation served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Segui, Harper)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KYOCERA AVX Components Corporation. (jens)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Donald Dollar. (jens)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against KYOCERA AVX Components Corporation (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-1144761.), filed by Donald Dollar. Service due by 2/26/2024. (jens)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dollar v. KYOCERA AVX Components Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dollar
Represented By: Harper Todd Segui
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Philip J Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYOCERA AVX Components Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?