Howell v. Upgrade Inc
Plaintiff: Lindsey Howell and Wallace Lindsey Howell
Defendant: Upgrade Inc
Case Number: 6:2024cv04228
Filed: July 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: William S Brown
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2024 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Case Reassigned, 17 Notice Change of Case Number placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lindsey Howell, 202 Lindseybrook Trail, Mauldin, SC 29662. (rweb, )
September 18, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER, 6:24-cv-04228-JDA-WSB. Send all filings to Clerk of Court, 250 East North St, Greenville, SC 29601. (rweb, )
September 18, 2024 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge William Stevens Brown. Judge Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to William Stevens Brown.(cwil, )
September 10, 2024 Filing 14 REPLY by Lindsey Howell to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(pbri, )
September 9, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Upgrade, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint And For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Response filed by Upgrade Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/16/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Rowh, Chandler)
August 28, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindsey Howell re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time MOTION to Amend/Correct (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rweb, )
August 26, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time and MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Lindsey Howell. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Second Amended Complaint)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(rweb, ) Modified on 8/28/2024 see also #12 certificate of service (rweb, ).
August 8, 2024 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lindsey Howell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(rweb, )
August 8, 2024 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Roseboro Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lindsey Howell, 202 Lindseybrook Trail, Mauldin, SC 29662. (rweb, )
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by 9/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 8/8/24. (rweb, )
August 7, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss by Upgrade Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Siachos, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2024: #1 Memo in Support) (rweb, ). Modified on 8/8/2024 to add Memorandum in Support (rweb, ).
August 2, 2024 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order and public docket sheet placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lindsey Howell, 202 Lindseybrook Trail, Mauldin, SC 29662. (rweb, )
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to submit fully completed and signed pro se partys answers to Rule 26.01 interrogatories, which are attached to this Order within 21 days. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 8/2/24. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Partys Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)(rweb, )
July 31, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Upgrade Inc.(rweb, )
July 31, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-CP-23-04076. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11908020), filed by Upgrade Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service Complaint, #4 Certificate of Service Amended Complaint)(rweb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Upgrade Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Lindsey Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upgrade Inc
Represented By: Peter George Siachos
Represented By: Chandler D Rowh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?