Seabrooke v. Barnwell County Detention Center
Plaintiff: John Seabrooke
Defendant: Tahira Thomas, C/O Miller and Sgt. Priester
Case Number: 6:2024cv05120
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2024 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 14 Text Order, #13 Second Proper Form Order, Blank Summons and USM-285 (3) placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John Seabrooke, #61010, Barnwell County Detention Center, 57 Wall Street, Barnwell, SC 29812. (agig)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/12/24.(agig)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/12/24. (agig)
October 25, 2024 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Summons, per request in #6 placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John Seabrooke, #61010, Barnwell County Detention Center, 57 Wall Street, Barnwell, SC 29812. (agig)
October 25, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by John Seabrooke. Response to Motion due by 11/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes) No proposed order. Motions referred to Kevin McDonald. (agig)
October 25, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barnwell County Detention Center, filed by John Seabrooke. Service due by 1/23/2025. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Envelopes)(agig)
October 8, 2024 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, Complaint form with case number, Summons, USM form, IFP form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John Seabrooke #4010, Barnwell County Detention Center, 318 Calhoun St, Barnwell, SC 29812. (pbri, )
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/8/24. (pbri, )
September 19, 2024 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: COLUMBIA. (agig)
September 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barnwell County Detention Center, filed by John Seabrooke. Service due by 12/18/2024 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(agig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seabrooke v. Barnwell County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Seabrooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahira Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Priester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?