Moss et al v. Spartanburg County School District No 7
Plaintiff: Robert Moss, Ellen Tillett and Freedom From Religion Foundation Inc
Defendant: Spartanburg County School District No 7
Case Number: 7:2009cv01586
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Spartanburg Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 OPINION AND ORDER taxing costs against the Plaintiffs in the amount of $4,871.18. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/17/11. (sfla)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION and ORDER denying 71 Motion for Summary Judgment by Freedom From Religion Foundation Inc, Melisa Moss, Robert Moss, Ellen Tillett; granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment by Spartanburg County School District No 7; denying as moot 81 Motion to Strike Declarations of Plaintiffs' Counsel and Audio Expert in re motion 71 ; denying as moot 82 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Affidavits in re motion 71 ; denying as moot 83 Motion to Strike Inadmissable Evidence from Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Memorandum in re motion 71 . Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 4/5/11.(sfla)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Joinder of the state of South Carolina as a co-defendant. If the South Carolina Attorney General's Office wishes to respond, it shall respond within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/25/10.(sfla)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying as moot 36 Motion for Leave to File; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Establishment Clause claim; granting 33 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Equal Protection Clause claim. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/17/09.(awil)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Spartanburg County School District No 7. If no response is filed within ten (10) days from the date of this order, this action will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/1/09. (awil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss et al v. Spartanburg County School District No 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moss
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Tillett
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom From Religion Foundation Inc
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County School District No 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?