Davy et al v. Duke Energy of The Carolinas LLC et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Charles Davy and Sharon Lee Davy
Defendant: Duke Energy of The Carolinas LLC, Energy Conservation Solutions Inc, GreenSky Trade Credit LLC and Spartanburg County Building Codes and Fire Services
Case Number: 7:2015cv04927
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Spartanburg Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Entry of Consent Order. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/22/2016.(abuc)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 59 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/11/2016.(abuc)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Remand; granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in pa rt 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, (ECF No. 22 ), is dismissed as to Defendant Spartanburg County, and Plaintiffs' claims for Negligent Supervision and Declaratory Judgment are dismissed as to Defendant Duke Energy and Defendant Greensky. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/4/2016.(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davy et al v. Duke Energy of The Carolinas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Charles Davy
Represented By: Travis Dane Hilka
Represented By: Timothy M Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lee Davy
Represented By: Travis Dane Hilka
Represented By: Timothy M Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy of The Carolinas LLC
Represented By: H Sam Mabry, III
Represented By: Joshua D Spencer
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Conservation Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lauren S Price
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreenSky Trade Credit LLC
Represented By: Wesley D Few
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County Building Codes and Fire Services
Represented By: John Robert Devlin, Jr
Represented By: Carter R Massingill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?