United States of America v. 40000 dollars in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 40000 dollars in US Currency
Interested Party: Kendrick Lamont Harris
Case Number: 7:2018cv02592
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION Motion for Enlargement of Time re #12 MOTION to Strike Answer by Kendrick Lamont Harris. Response to Motion due by 11/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Seized Asset Claim Form, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Seizure of Property and Initiation of Administrative Forfeiture Proceedings, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Judicial Forfeiture Action, #4 Affidavit, #5 Memo in Support Motion for Enlargement of Time)No proposed order.(Johnston, Andrew) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/13/2018) (abuc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #6 Certificate of Service) (abuc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/13/2018) (abuc). Modified to replace documents with corrected documents and to add descriptions to attachments, all provided by filing user on 11/13/2018 (abuc).
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Answer by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 11/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sherard, Carrie)
October 8, 2018 Filing 9 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 40000 dollars in US Currency.(Johnston, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $40,000 in U.S. Currency. (Sherard, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $40,000 in U.S. Currency. (Sherard, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (abuc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (sfla)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (sfla)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 40000 dollars in US Currency (Filing fee $ 400.) filed by United States of America. Service due by 12/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 40000 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40000 dollars in US Currency
Represented By: Andrew J Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kendrick Lamont Harris
Represented By: Andrew J Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?