Nelson v. American Credit Acceptance LLC

Plaintiff: Richard Nelson
Defendant: American Credit Acceptance LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv02816
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by American Credit Acceptance LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Coleman)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Campbell, George)
November 8, 2018 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Credit Acceptance LLC.(kmca) Document filed as an attachment to #5 Letter, but should have been filed separately. (kmca)
November 8, 2018 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER American Credit Acceptance LLC answer due 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Granting Extension, # (2) LR 26.01 Answers)(Campbell, George) Modified on 11/8/2018: attachment #2 removed and filed separately as document #6 LR 26.01s (kmca).
October 18, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to American Credit Acceptance LLC. (kmca)
October 17, 2018 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Nelson.(kmca)
October 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against American Credit Acceptance LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8059838), filed by Richard Nelson. Service due by 1/15/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. American Credit Acceptance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nelson
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Credit Acceptance LLC
Represented By: George Anthony Campbell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?