Moorhead v. HKA Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Moorhead
Defendant: HKA Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00265
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-02490. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Files transferred electronically to: *District of South Carolina*.*85 Broad Street**Charleston, South Carolina 29401*. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue) (lrf) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 NON Opposition re #10 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Joseph Moorhead. (Hartman, Jared) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference [ECF No. #12 ]. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference reset for 2/12/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 12/28/2018. (lrf) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by HKA Enterprises, LLC. (Johnson, Timothy) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hartman, Jared)(sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue by HKA Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration of Lisa Higgins in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Johnson, Timothy) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Clint S. Engleson on behalf of HKA Enterprises, LLC (Engleson, Clint)Attorney Clint S. Engleson added to party HKA Enterprises, LLC (pty:dft) (QC mailer sent re: improper format)(sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the telephonic, attorneys-only EarlyNeutral Evaluation Conference (ENE) and Case Management Conference (CMC)originally scheduled for 1/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby reset to 1/4/2019at 9:00 a.m. All other guidelines and requirements remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 12/3/2018.(lrf) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Ryan Wilson on behalf of Joseph Moorhead (Wilson, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Ryan Wilson added to party Joseph Moorhead(pty:pla) (QC mailer sent re: improper format, missing certificate of service) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. A telephonic, attorneys-only Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 1/3/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Joint Discovery Plan due 12/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 11/17/2018.(lrf) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Boyle, Jr on behalf of Joseph Moorhead (Boyle, Michael)Attorney Michael J. Boyle, Jr added to party Joseph Moorhead(pty:pla)(QC mailer sent re: improper format, missing certificate of service) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief by HKA Enterprises, LLC.(Johnson, Timothy)Attorney Timothy L. Johnson added to party HKA Enterprises, LLC (pty:dft) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Moorhead. All Defendants served. (Hartman, Jared) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against HKA Enterprises, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11847720.), filed by Joseph Moorhead. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02490-L-LL. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Hartman, Jared)(jrm)(sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moorhead v. HKA Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKA Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Timothy L. Johnson
Represented By: Clint S. Engleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Moorhead
Represented By: Jared M. Hartman
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?