Lathan v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Johnny Lathan
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv01452
Filed: May 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company(Farr, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, Johnny Lathan.(Farr, Nicholas) Modified on 7/10/2019: to add joint filer as listed (kmca).
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, Johnny Lathan.(Farr, Nicholas) Modified on 7/10/2019: to add joint filer as listed (kmca).
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 11/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/6/19. (kmca)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/26/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/10/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/10/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 7/10/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/19/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/21/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/21/2019, Discovery due by 11/20/2019, Motions due by 12/4/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/3/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 2/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/6/19. (kmca)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company.(Farr, Nicholas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company.(Farr, Nicholas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (kmca)
May 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnny Lathan.(kmca)
May 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8452384), filed by Johnny Lathan. Service due by 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Declarations Homeowners Policy)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lathan v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Natalie Rae Ecker
Represented By: Nicholas Andrew Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Lathan
Represented By: Joseph A Mooneyham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?