Long v. Minghua USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alicia D Long
Defendant: Minghua Management LLC and Minghua USA Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv01496
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Minghua USA Inc.(Hedgepath, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Minghua USA Inc.(Hedgepath, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Minghua USA Inc, filed by Alicia D Long. Service due by 9/17/2019 (Arnold, W)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Minghua Management LLC answer due 7/9/2019; Minghua USA Inc answer due 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 6-13-19 Extension Email from Andy Arnold, Esq.)(Hedgepath, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alicia D Long. Minghua Management LLC served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail green card)(Arnold, W)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 Reason: incorrect event, refiled by clerk Corrected Filing Document Number #6 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 6/3/2019 (kric, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alicia D Long. Minghua USA Inc served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(kric, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Minghua Management LLC, Minghua USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Minghua Management LLC Summons)(kric, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alicia D Long.(kric, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Minghua Management LLC, Minghua USA Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8461105.), filed by Alicia D Long. Service due by 8/21/2019(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Minghua USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minghua Management LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: James T Hedgepath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minghua USA Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: James T Hedgepath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia D Long
Represented By: W Andrew Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?