Baldwin v. United States of America, The
Plaintiff: William Matthew Baldwin
Defendant: United States of America, The
Case Number: 7:2019cv01800
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #6 Summons Returned Executed. Reason: attorney re-filed to correct event. Corrected Filing Document Number #7 Summons Returned Executed. Filed same day on 8/22/19. (kmca)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Matthew Baldwin. United States of America, The served on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic Return Receipt)(McGowan, Chad) Modified on 8/23/2019: to add text (served and answer dates) (kmca).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie V Newman on behalf of United States of America, The (Newman, Christie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, The. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (abuc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William Matthew Baldwin.(abuc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, The (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8522847.), filed by William Matthew Baldwin. Service due by 9/23/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Matthew Baldwin
Represented By: Chance Michael Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?