Barbare v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: William C Barbare, Jr
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv01891
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/19/19. (sfla)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Joint Stipulation Deadline 10/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/19/19. (sfla)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Patterson, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Patterson, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William C Barbare, Jr. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (sfla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William C Barbare, Jr.(sfla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8538226) filed by William C Barbare, Jr. Service due by 10/1/2019(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbare v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Barbare, Jr
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?