Arrowood v. Independent Order of Foresters, The
Plaintiff: Randall Scott Arrowood
Defendant: Independent Order of Foresters, The
Case Number: 7:2019cv01892
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff's Reply Response filed by Randall Scott Arrowood. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Plaintiff Stipulation)(Churdar, Douglas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Devlin, Chadwick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2019 to remove documents which are already a part of the Court's record which showed a duplicate file stamp which was unreadable) (sfla).
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #20 Response in Opposition re #13 Motion to Remand to State Court. Reply due by 8/30/2019. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on August 28, 2019. (bedw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Randall Scott Arrowood. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Churdar, Douglas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Independent Order of Foresters, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/23/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Devlin, Chadwick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 3/26/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/12/19. (sfla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 LCR 26.03 Responses and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Independent Order of Foresters, The.(Devlin, Chadwick)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Independent Order of Foresters, The.(Devlin, Chadwick)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Independent Order of Foresters, The(Devlin, Chadwick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Independent Order of Foresters, The.(Devlin, Chadwick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Randall Scott Arrowood. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Summary of Benefits)No proposed order.(Churdar, Douglas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Independent Order of Foresters, The, filed by Randall Scott Arrowood. Service due by 10/28/2019 (Churdar, Douglas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Randall Scott Arrowood.(Churdar, Douglas)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER; Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2020, Discovery due by 3/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/2/2020, Motions due by 4/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/15/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/9/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/9/19. (sfla)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Independent Order of Foresters, The.(Devlin, Chadwick)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Independent Order of Foresters, The.(sfla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-1972. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8538541) filed by Independent Order of Foresters, The. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrowood v. Independent Order of Foresters, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Order of Foresters, The
Represented By: Don Lawrence Kristinik, III
Represented By: Chadwick S Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Scott Arrowood
Represented By: Douglas A Churdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?