Walker et al v. Upright Law et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Denise Walker and George Robert Walker
Defendant: Upright Law and Law Solutions Chicago LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv02164
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Response filed by Law Solutions Chicago LLC, Upright Law. (Darwin, Andrew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Response filed by George Robert Walker, Sherry Denise Walker.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/23/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Settment Agreement and Release, #2 Exhibit Exhibit - Defendant's Moton for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit - Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment)(O'Steen, F)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Law Solutions Chicago LLC, Upright Law. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Withdrawal of Reference Part 1, #2 Record of Withdrawal of Reference Part 2, #3 Transmittal of Record on Motion for Withdrawal of Reference)No proposed order.(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Upright Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Denise Walker
Represented By: F Lee O'Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Robert Walker
Represented By: F Lee O'Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upright Law
Represented By: Andrew Todd Darwin
Represented By: Paul W Owen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Solutions Chicago LLC
Represented By: Andrew Todd Darwin
Represented By: Paul W Owen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?