Russell v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Candy Bright Russell
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 7:2019cv02628
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-04754. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of South Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
December 26, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-04754-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
December 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14997485 filed by Candy Bright Russell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Bright Russell
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?