Burnett v. Kohls Corporation
Plaintiff: Lisa Burnett
Defendant: Kohls Corporation
Case Number: 7:2019cv03255
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 6/29/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/8/20. (kmca)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/28/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/11/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/11/2020, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 2/11/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/23/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/22/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/22/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/22/2020, Discovery due by 6/22/2020, Motions due by 7/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/5/2020 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/8/20. (kmca)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kohls Corporation.(Rummage, Ryan)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kohls Corporation.(Rummage, Ryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Deficiency Notification (Prior notifications sent via e-mail and phone) In Re Document Number: #5 Summons Returned. A cover page with the filing attorney's signature is needed along with a copy of the Affidavit of Process Server. (kmca) Modified on 12/13/2019: corrected (kmca).
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's answer due by 1/8/20. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/10/19.(kmca) Modified on 12/10/2019: to add "text" (kmca).
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by Kohls Corporation. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ryan S. Rummage)No proposed order.(Rummage, Ryan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Burnett. Kohls Corporation served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Bland, Chauntel) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/13/2019: to replace with corrected document (cover page signed by attorney) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 12/13/2019: #1 Affidavit of Service) (kmca).
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kohls Corporation. (kmca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lisa Burnett.(kmca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kohls Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8783576), filed by Lisa Burnett. Service due by 2/18/2020.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett v. Kohls Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Burnett
Represented By: Chauntel Demetrius Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?