Cochran v. Falcon Holdings Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cochran
Defendant: ACM Fatz VII LLC, Cafe Enterprises Inc and Falcon Holdings Management LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv03512
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
2 Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/4/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/4/2020, Discovery due by 7/6/2020, Motions due by 8/5/2020, Mediation Due by 8/5/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial after November 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/10/2020. (prou, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/10/2020.(prou, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Conference and Scheduling Order by ACM Fatz VII LLC, Falcon Holdings Management LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Scheduling Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Bingham, William)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Kimberly Cochran.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by ACM Fatz VII LLC, Falcon Holdings Management LLC.(Bingham, William)
February 5, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report by ACM Fatz VII LLC, Falcon Holdings Management LLC.(Bingham, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tawana Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/9/2020.(prou, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tawana Johnson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8866308) by ACM Fatz VII LLC, Falcon Holdings Management LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Verified Application for Admission of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing). Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Bingham, William) Modified on 1/9/2020 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ).
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 7/6/2020, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/7/2020. (prou, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/28/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/11/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/11/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/4/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/4/2020, Discovery due by 7/6/2020, Motions due by 8/5/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/3/2020, Mediation Due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/7/2020. (prou, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by ACM Fatz VII LLC.(Bingham, William)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Falcon Holdings Management LLC.(Bingham, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACM Fatz VII LLC. (Bingham, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Falcon Holdings Management LLC. (Bingham, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kimberly Cochran.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by ACM Fatz VII LLC.(prou, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Falcon Holdings Management LLC.(prou, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-04053. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8834046), filed by ACM Fatz VII LLC, Falcon Holdings Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. Falcon Holdings Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cochran
Represented By: Jeremy Randall Summerlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACM Fatz VII LLC
Represented By: William Shawn Bingham
Represented By: Tawana Blocker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Holdings Management LLC
Represented By: William Shawn Bingham
Represented By: Tawana Blocker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?