Goggin v. Blythe Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Goggin
Defendant: Blythe Construction Inc, Zachry Construction Corp, Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc, Cowan Systems LLC and John Allen Ferguson
Case Number: 7:2021cv03158
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Stair, Kent)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (alew, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas Goggin.(alew, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10097936.), filed by Thomas Goggin. Service due by 12/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreement for the Design & Construction of Interstate 85 Reconstruction, #2 Exhibit B-Transportation Management Plan for SCDOT, #3 Exhibit C-Brian Bottomley's Affidavit of Merit)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goggin v. Blythe Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Goggin
Represented By: Kenneth M Suggs
Represented By: Gerald D Jowers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blythe Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachry Construction Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc
Represented By: Kent T Stair
Represented By: Christina Perrin
Represented By: Tyler Paul Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowan Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Allen Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?