Plasman SC Inc v. Manu-Force Corp et al
Plaintiff: Plasman SC Inc
Defendant: Manu-Force Corp, Jeremy Dirck, Amanda Dirck, John Daniel Kearney Jr, Jennifer J Kearney, Daniel R Ruskin and Rocky
Case Number: 7:2024cv04894
Filed: September 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plasman SC Inc WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Jones, Celeste)
December 2, 2024 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 motion. All Defendants who have not yet filed a responsive pleading or relevant motion will do so by December 6, 2024. Plaintiff's responses and answers to any counterclaims are due by December 20, 2024. Replies are due by January 3, 2025. Discovery is stayed pending the Court's ruling on the Rule 12 motions. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/2/24.(alew)
November 26, 2024 Filing 21 Joint MOTION Enter Interim Scheduling Order by Plasman SC Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Jones, Celeste)
November 25, 2024 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plasman SC Inc. (Jones, Celeste) Modified on 12/2/2024 to edit text (alew).
November 21, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Amanda Dirck, Jeremy Dirck. Response to Motion due by 12/5/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smith, Joseph)
October 2, 2024 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Derek F. Meek for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/2/24.(alew)
October 1, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek Firth Meek ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-12021407) by Plasman SC Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Jones, Celeste)
September 20, 2024 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 motion for extension of time. All pending deadlines are stayed until November 21, 2024 to allow for the scheduled pending mediation. If this action does not settle at mediation, the parties should submit a joint status report by December 2, 2024. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/20/24.(alew)
September 19, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Sullivan for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/19/24.(alew)
September 19, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plasman SC Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jones, Celeste) Modified on 9/19/2024 to correct motion relief (alew). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 9/19/2024; modified to add motion relief per document (alew). Modified on 9/19/2024 to add docket entry relationships (alew).
September 18, 2024 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Plasman SC Inc.(Jones, Celeste)
September 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John O'Shea Sullivan ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11999907) by Plasman SC Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jones, Celeste) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/19/2024) (alew). Modified on 9/19/2024 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew).
September 18, 2024 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 6 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #7 . (alew)
September 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jennifer J Kearney, John Daniel Kearney Jr, Manu-Force Corp. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Burke, Russell)
September 10, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories (including section H) are due fourteen (14) days after removal.(agig)
September 6, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jennifer J Kearney, John Daniel Kearney Jr, Manu-Force Corp.(agig)
September 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP4203148. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11978195), filed by Manu-Force Corp, Jennifer J Kearney, John Daniel Kearney Jr. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(agig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plasman SC Inc v. Manu-Force Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manu-Force Corp
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Dirck
Represented By: Joseph Owen Smith
Represented By: Joshua Jennings Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Dirck
Represented By: Joseph Owen Smith
Represented By: Joshua Jennings Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Daniel Kearney Jr
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer J Kearney
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky
Represented By: Joseph Owen Smith
Represented By: Joshua Jennings Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasman SC Inc
Represented By: John O'Shea Sullivan
Represented By: John O'Shea Sullivan
Represented By: Celeste Tiller Jones
Represented By: Derek F Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?